Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1494 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *hb1494*
66
77 HOUSE BILL 1494
88 F2 4lr3521
99 CF SB 745
1010 By: Delegates Nawrocki, Addison, Allen, Anderton, Baker, Guyton, Jacobs,
1111 Lehman, J. Long, M. Morgan, T. Morgan, Szeliga, and Wivell
1212 Introduced and read first time: February 16, 2024
1313 Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations
1414
1515 A BILL ENTITLED
1616
1717 AN ACT concerning 1
1818
1919 Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine – Funding 2
2020
2121 FOR the purpose of increasing the number of Maryland residents in the student body of 3
2222 the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine, contingent on certain 4
2323 agreements; and generally relating to the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary 5
2424 Medicine. 6
2525
2626 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7
2727 Article – Education 8
2828 Section 13–801 through 13–803 9
2929 Annotated Code of Maryland 10
3030 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11
3131
3232 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12
3333 Article – Education 13
3434 Section 13–804 14
3535 Annotated Code of Maryland 15
3636 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16
3737
3838 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17
3939 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18
4040
4141 Article – Education 19
4242
4343 13–801. 20
4444
4545 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 21
4646
4747 (b) “Board” means the Budget and Program Review Board. 22
4848 2 HOUSE BILL 1494
4949
5050
5151 (c) “College” means the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 1
5252 Medicine. 2
5353
5454 13–802. 3
5555
5656 (a) There is a Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary Medicine. 4
5757
5858 (b) In addition to the provisions of this subtitle the College is subject to the 5
5959 provisions of Title 11 (Maryland Higher Education Commission) of this article. 6
6060
6161 (c) The College shall be operated under the terms and conditions agreed to in: 7
6262
6363 (1) The Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 8
6464 and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 9
6565
6666 (2) The Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 10
6767 University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 11
6868 in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 12
6969
7070 (d) The College shall be operated as one school with an administrative head at 13
7171 each university. 14
7272
7373 (e) The student body of the College shall consist of 50 Virginia residents, [30] 42 15
7474 Maryland residents, and 10 at–large. 16
7575
7676 13–803. 17
7777
7878 (a) There is a Budget and Program Review Board. 18
7979
8080 (b) The Board is responsible for determining annually the resource needs of the 19
8181 professional instructional program of the College. 20
8282
8383 (c) The Board shall consist of the following seven members: 21
8484
8585 (1) The Dean of the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 22
8686 Medicine, who shall serve as Chairman of the Board; 23
8787
8888 (2) The Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural Resources of the 24
8989 University of Maryland, College Park Campus; 25
9090
9191 (3) The Senior Vice President and Provost of the Virginia Polytechnic 26
9292 Institute and State University; 27
9393
9494 (4) The Vice President and Provost of the University of Maryland, College 28
9595 Park Campus; 29
9696
9797 (5) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 30 HOUSE BILL 1494 3
9898
9999
100100 Polytechnic Institute and State University; 1
101101
102102 (6) An appointee of the President of the Virginia Polytechnic Institute and 2
103103 State University; and 3
104104
105105 (7) The Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University 4
106106 System of Maryland or the Vice Chancellor’s successor. 5
107107
108108 (d) The Board shall: 6
109109
110110 (1) Determine the cost share for each state; 7
111111
112112 (2) Set the proportion of costs to be funded by tuition; and 8
113113
114114 (3) Periodically review and adjust the building use fees charged to the 9
115115 students of the College. 10
116116
117117 (e) The appropriate fiscal support staff of each university, which shall include the 11
118118 Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University System of Maryland, 12
119119 shall provide fiscal support to the Board. 13
120120
121121 13–804. 14
122122
123123 (a) To calculate the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 15
124124 College, costs associated with graduate education, continuing education, the agricultural 16
125125 experiment stations, cooperative extension services, and expenditures associated with 17
126126 contractual grant research shall be excluded. 18
127127
128128 (b) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 19
129129 Polytechnic Institute and State University shall be responsible for providing the Board with 20
130130 the cost data on which the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 21
131131 College shall be determined after consulting with the fiscal support staff of the Virginia 22
132132 Polytechnic Institute and State University and the University of Maryland, College Park 23
133133 Campus. 24
134134
135135 (c) To determine the appropriate level of general fund contributions for meeting 25
136136 the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the College to be requested 26
137137 from the executives and legislatures of the State of Maryland and the Commonwealth of 27
138138 Virginia, respectively, revenues estimated to be generated by tuition fees and charges, 28
139139 appropriate federal funds, instructional fees, and other instructional sources of income 29
140140 shall be subtracted from the calculations. 30
141141
142142 (d) The State of Maryland shall provide the appropriate level of general funds to 31
143143 meet the financial requirements of the professional instructional program of the College. 32
144144
145145 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 33
146146 4 HOUSE BILL 1494
147147
148148
149149 (a) This Act may not take effect until the Commonwealth of Virginia concurs with 1
150150 revisions, in accordance with § 13–802(e) of the Education Article, as enacted by Section 1 2
151151 of this Act, to the terms and conditions agreed to in: 3
152152
153153 (1) the Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 4
154154 and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 5
155155
156156 (2) the Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 6
157157 University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 7
158158 in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 8
159159
160160 (b) The Department of Legislative Services shall notify the appropriate officials 9
161161 of the Commonwealth of Virginia of the enactment of this Act. 10
162162
163163 (c) On or before July 1, 2024, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural 11
164164 Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall request a 12
165165 determination letter from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 13
166166 Polytechnic Institute and State University confirming the concurrence of the revisions 14
167167 described in subsection (a) of this section. 15
168168
169169 (d) Within 5 days after receiving the determination letter requested under 16
170170 subsection (c) of this section from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 17
171171 Polytechnic Institute and State University, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and 18
172172 Natural Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall forward a 19
173173 copy of the letter to the Department of Legislative Services. 20
174174
175175 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, subject to Section 2 of this 21
176176 Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2024. 22
177177