Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1494 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/16/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1494*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1494 
F2   	4lr3521 
    	CF SB 745 
By: Delegates Nawrocki, Addison, Allen, Anderton, Baker, Guyton, Jacobs, 
Lehman, J. Long, M. Morgan, T. Morgan, Szeliga, and Wivell 
Introduced and read first time: February 16, 2024 
Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine – Funding 2 
 
FOR the purpose of increasing the number of Maryland residents in the student body of 3 
the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine, contingent on certain 4 
agreements; and generally relating to the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary 5 
Medicine. 6 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7 
 Article – Education 8 
Section 13–801 through 13–803 9 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 10 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Education 13 
Section 13–804 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 
 
Article – Education 19 
 
13–801. 20 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 21 
 
 (b) “Board” means the Budget and Program Review Board. 22 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 1494  
 
 
 (c) “College” means the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 1 
Medicine. 2 
 
13–802. 3 
 
 (a) There is a Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary Medicine. 4 
 
 (b) In addition to the provisions of this subtitle the College is subject to the 5 
provisions of Title 11 (Maryland Higher Education Commission) of this article. 6 
 
 (c) The College shall be operated under the terms and conditions agreed to in: 7 
 
 (1) The Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 8 
and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 9 
 
 (2) The Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 10 
University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 11 
in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 12 
 
 (d) The College shall be operated as one school with an administrative head at 13 
each university. 14 
 
 (e) The student body of the College shall consist of 50 Virginia residents, [30] 42 15 
Maryland residents, and 10 at–large. 16 
 
13–803. 17 
 
 (a) There is a Budget and Program Review Board. 18 
 
 (b) The Board is responsible for determining annually the resource needs of the 19 
professional instructional program of the College. 20 
 
 (c) The Board shall consist of the following seven members: 21 
 
 (1) The Dean of the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 22 
Medicine, who shall serve as Chairman of the Board; 23 
 
 (2) The Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural Resources of the 24 
University of Maryland, College Park Campus; 25 
 
 (3) The Senior Vice President and Provost of the Virginia Polytechnic 26 
Institute and State University; 27 
 
 (4) The Vice President and Provost of the University of Maryland, College 28 
Park Campus; 29 
 
 (5) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 30   	HOUSE BILL 1494 	3 
 
 
Polytechnic Institute and State University; 1 
 
 (6) An appointee of the President of the Virginia Polytechnic Institute and 2 
State University; and 3 
 
 (7) The Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University 4 
System of Maryland or the Vice Chancellor’s successor. 5 
 
 (d) The Board shall: 6 
 
 (1) Determine the cost share for each state; 7 
 
 (2) Set the proportion of costs to be funded by tuition; and 8 
 
 (3) Periodically review and adjust the building use fees charged to the 9 
students of the College. 10 
 
 (e) The appropriate fiscal support staff of each university, which shall include the 11 
Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University System of Maryland, 12 
shall provide fiscal support to the Board. 13 
 
13–804. 14 
 
 (a) To calculate the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 15 
College, costs associated with graduate education, continuing education, the agricultural 16 
experiment stations, cooperative extension services, and expenditures associated with 17 
contractual grant research shall be excluded. 18 
 
 (b) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 19 
Polytechnic Institute and State University shall be responsible for providing the Board with 20 
the cost data on which the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 21 
College shall be determined after consulting with the fiscal support staff of the Virginia 22 
Polytechnic Institute and State University and the University of Maryland, College Park 23 
Campus. 24 
 
 (c) To determine the appropriate level of general fund contributions for meeting 25 
the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the College to be requested 26 
from the executives and legislatures of the State of Maryland and the Commonwealth of 27 
Virginia, respectively, revenues estimated to be generated by tuition fees and charges, 28 
appropriate federal funds, instructional fees, and other instructional sources of income 29 
shall be subtracted from the calculations. 30 
 
 (d) The State of Maryland shall provide the appropriate level of general funds to 31 
meet the financial requirements of the professional instructional program of the College. 32 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 33 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 1494  
 
 
 (a) This Act may not take effect until the Commonwealth of Virginia concurs with 1 
revisions, in accordance with § 13–802(e) of the Education Article, as enacted by Section 1 2 
of this Act, to the terms and conditions agreed to in: 3 
 
 (1) the Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 4 
and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 5 
 
 (2) the Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 6 
University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 7 
in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 8 
 
 (b) The Department of Legislative Services shall notify the appropriate officials 9 
of the Commonwealth of Virginia of the enactment of this Act. 10 
 
 (c) On or before July 1, 2024, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural 11 
Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall request a 12 
determination letter from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 13 
Polytechnic Institute and State University confirming the concurrence of the revisions 14 
described in subsection (a) of this section. 15 
 
 (d) Within 5 days after receiving the determination letter requested under 16 
subsection (c) of this section from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 17 
Polytechnic Institute and State University, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and 18 
Natural Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall forward a 19 
copy of the letter to the Department of Legislative Services. 20 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, subject to Section 2 of this 21 
Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2024. 22