Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973727/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Rereferred to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |