Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1499 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/03/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1499*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1499 
D4   	4lr3420 
    	CF SB 708 
By: Delegate Clippinger 
Introduced and read first time: February 16, 2024 
Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations 
Re–referred to: Judiciary, February 26, 2024 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 20, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Family Law – Kinship Care 2 
 
FOR the purpose of altering the definition of relative to mean an individual who is a kinship 3 
caregiver for purposes of provisions of law relating to children in need of assistance; 4 
altering provisions of law relating to the kinship care program in the Department of 5 
Human Services and certain procedures for the placement of children in need of  6 
out–of–home placement; and generally relating to kinship care. 7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 8 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 9 
 Section 3–801(a) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 13 
 Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 14 
 Section 3–801(x) 15 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 16 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)  17 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 18 
 Article – Family Law 19 
Section 1–101(h) 20 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 1499  
 
 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 1 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 2 
 Article – Family Law 3 
Section 5–534 4 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 5 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 8 
 
Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 9 
 
3–801. 10 
 
 (a) In this subtitle, the following words have the meanings indicated. 11 
 
 (x) “Relative” means an individual who is A KINSHIP CAREGIVER , AS DEFINED 12 
IN § 5–534 OF THE FAMILY LAW ARTICLE[: 13 
 
 (1) Related to the child by blood or marriage within five degrees of 14 
consanguinity or affinity under the civil law; and 15 
 
 (2) (i) At least 21 years old; or 16 
 
 (ii) 1. At least 18 years old; and 17 
 
 2. Lives with a spouse who is at least 21 years old].  18 
 
Article – Family Law 19 
 
1–101. 20 
 
 (h) “Local department” means: 21 
 
 (1) a local department of social services; or 22 
 
 (2) in Montgomery County, the county department of health and human 23 
services. 24 
 
5–534. 25 
 
 (a) (1) In this section [the following words have the meanings indicated. 26 
 
 (2) “Kinship], “KINSHIP caregiver” means an individual: 27 
   	HOUSE BILL 1499 	3 
 
 
 (i) with whom a child who is in the care, custody, or guardianship of 1 
the local department may be placed for temporary or long–term care other than adoption; 2 
and 3 
 
 (ii) who is approved by the local department under subsection (e) of 4 
this section. 5 
 
 (2) “KINSHIP CAREGIVER ” INCLUDES: 6 
 
 (I) A KINSHIP PARENT ; 7 
 
 (II) AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS RELATED TO THE CHILD THROUGH 8 
BLOOD OR MARRIAGE , ADOPTION, TRIBAL LAW OR CUSTOM , OR CULTURAL CUSTOM 9 
OR PRACTICE; AND 10 
 
 (III) AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS UNRELATED TO THE CHI LD BUT HAS 11 
A STRONG FAM ILIAL OR OTHER SIGNI FICANT BOND WITH THE CHILD, OR IS A 12 
PERSON IDENTIFIED BY THE CHILD’S PARENT. 13 
 
 [(3) “Kinship parent” means an individual who is related by blood or 14 
marriage within five degrees of consanguinity or affinity under the civil law rule to a child 15 
who is in the care, custody, or guardianship of the local department and with whom the 16 
child may be placed for temporary or long–term care other than adoption.] 17 
 
 (b) The [Administration] SECRETARY OF HUMAN SERVICES shall establish 18 
AND MAINTAIN a kinship care program. 19 
 
 (c) (1) In selecting a placement that is in the best interests of a child in need 20 
of out–of–home placement, [the local department shall, as a first priority, attempt to place 21 
the child with a kinship parent] IN THE ABSENCE OF GO OD CAUSE TO THE CONTRARY , 22 
THE LOCAL DEPARTMENT SHALL GIVE PREFERENC E TO PLACEMENT WITH A 23 
KINSHIP CAREGIVER . 24 
 
 (2) The local department shall exhaust all reasonable resources to MAKE 25 
PROACTIVE, THOROUGH , AND TIMELY EFFORTS T O locate a kinship [parent] 26 
CAREGIVER for initial placement of the child. 27 
 
 (3) If [no kinship parent is located] THE LOCAL DEPARTMENT CANNOT 28 
LOCATE A KINSHIP CAR EGIVER at the time of the initial placement, THEN PREFERENCE 29 
SHALL BE GIVEN TO A PLACEMENT THAT MOST APPROXIMATES A FAMIL Y IN WHICH 30 
THE CHILD’S SPECIAL NEEDS , IF ANY, MAY BE MET, TAKING INTO ACCOUNT THE 31 
FOLLOWING : 32 
  4 	HOUSE BILL 1499  
 
 
 (i) [except as provided in item (ii) of this paragraph, the child shall 1 
be placed in a foster care setting; or] THE PROXIMITY OF THE PLACEMENT TO THE 2 
CHILD’S HOME, EXTENDED FAMILY , OR SIBLINGS; 3 
 
 (ii) [as an alternative to foster care, the local department may place 4 
the child for initial placement with a kinship caregiver] THE CHILD’S CULTURE OR 5 
LANGUAGE CONTINUI TY; 6 
 
 (III) THE CHILD’S AGE; AND 7 
 
 (IV) THE CHILD’S DEVELOPMENTAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS .  8 
 
 (4) If [a kinship parent or] a kinship caregiver is located subsequent to the 9 
placement of a child in a foster care setting, the local department [may] SHALL, [if it is] in 10 
the best interest of the child, place the child with the [kinship parent or] kinship caregiver. 11 
 
 (d) [(1)] A kinship [parent] CAREGIVER may not be under the age of 18 years. 12 
 
 [(2) A kinship caregiver may not be under the age of 21 years.] 13 
 
 (e) (1) The local department [may] SHALL approve an individual as a kinship 14 
caregiver [only] if: 15 
 
 (i) the individual is related to the child [by] THROUGH blood or 16 
marriage [beyond five degrees of consanguinity or affinity under the civil law or rule or is 17 
a close family friend of the child or the child’s family], ADOPTION, TRIBAL LAW OR 18 
CUSTOM, OR CULTURAL CUSTOM O R PRACTICE; 19 
 
 (ii) the individual has a strong familial or other significant bond to 20 
the child or the child’s family OR IS A PERSON IDENT IFIED BY THE CHILD ’S PARENT; 21 
AND 22 
 
 [(iii) the individual has maintained regular contact with the child or 23 
the child’s family sufficient to demonstrate strong familiarity with the child’s activities and 24 
daily needs; and 25 
 
 (iv)] (III) placement with the individual is in the child’s best 26 
interest. 27 
 
 (2) A prospective kinship caregiver shall [submit] PROVIDE to the local 28 
department [an affidavit that includes specific facts] ANY INFORMATION THE LOCAL 29 
DEPARTMENT REQUESTS to enable the local department to determine whether the 30 
individual meets the criteria specified in paragraph (1) of this subsection. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 1499 	5 
 
 
 (f) The Administration shall adopt regulations [to implement this section that 1 
are consistent with the provisions of this section] AND POLICIES CONSIST ENT WITH THIS 2 
SECTION. 3 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 4 
October 1, 2024. 5 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.