House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/17/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |