House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 856 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (125-10) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (31-12) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623427/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (104-34) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 10/13/2023 | Pre-filed |