House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (103-34) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {903026/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (103-32) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {103621/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Pre-filed |