House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638 | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (33-12) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-36) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Floor Amendment {463827/1 (Delegate Qi) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Qi) Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Pre-filed |