Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 638 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 638 | |
5 | - | (House Bill 211) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *hb0211* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Business Regulation – Contractors, Subcontractors, and Brokers – Prohibited | |
10 | - | Conduct | |
10 | + | HOUSE BILL 211 | |
11 | + | C2, C3 4lr1283 | |
12 | + | (PRE–FILED) CF SB 648 | |
13 | + | By: Delegate Taveras | |
14 | + | Requested: October 30, 2023 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Economic Matters | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | House action: Adopted with floor amendments | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 21, 2024 | |
11 | 20 | ||
12 | - | FOR the purpose of prohibiting a person from serving or acting as a contractor, a | |
13 | - | subcontractor, or a broker between a contractor and subcontractor during a certain | |
14 | - | period after the person was convicted of a certain offense under federal or state law; | |
15 | - | and generally relating to contractors, subcontractors, and brokers. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
16 | 22 | ||
17 | - | BY adding to | |
18 | - | Article – Business Regulation | |
19 | - | Section 19–107 | |
20 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
21 | - | (2015 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
22 | 24 | ||
23 | - | ||
24 | - | ||
25 | + | Business Regulation – Contractors, Subcontractors, and Brokers – Prohibited 2 | |
26 | + | Conduct 3 | |
25 | 27 | ||
26 | - | Article – Business Regulation | |
28 | + | FOR the purpose of prohibiting a person from serving or acting as a contractor, a 4 | |
29 | + | subcontractor, or a broker between a contractor and subcontractor during a certain 5 | |
30 | + | period after the person was convicted of a certain offense under federal or state law; 6 | |
31 | + | and generally relating to contractors, subcontractors, and brokers. 7 | |
27 | 32 | ||
28 | - | 19–107. | |
33 | + | BY adding to 8 | |
34 | + | Article – Business Regulation 9 | |
35 | + | Section 19–107 10 | |
36 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 11 | |
37 | + | (2015 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 | |
29 | 38 | ||
30 | - | A PERSON MAY NOT SERVE OR ACT AS A CONTRACTOR , A SUBCONTRACTOR , OR | |
31 | - | A BROKER BETWEEN A C ONTRACTOR AND SUBCON TRACTOR IN THE STATE DURING | |
32 | - | THE 5–YEAR PERIOD IMMEDIAT ELY FOLLOWING THE DA TE THE PERSON WAS | |
33 | - | CONVICTED OF AN OFFE NSE CONSTITUTING CRI MINAL MALFEASANCE , | |
34 | - | MISFEASANCE , OR NONFEASANCE UNDER ANY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW. | |
39 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 | |
40 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 | |
35 | 41 | ||
36 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
37 | - | October 1, 2024. | |
42 | + | Article – Business Regulation 15 | |
38 | 43 | ||
39 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024. | |
44 | + | 19–107. 16 | |
45 | + | ||
46 | + | A PERSON MAY NOT SERVE OR ACT AS A CONTRACTOR , A SUBCONTRACTOR , OR 17 | |
47 | + | A BROKER BETWEEN A CON TRACTOR AND SUBCONTR ACTOR IN THE STATE DURING 18 | |
48 | + | THE 5–YEAR PERIOD IMMEDIAT ELY FOLLOWING THE DA TE THE PERSON WAS 19 2 HOUSE BILL 211 | |
49 | + | ||
50 | + | ||
51 | + | CONVICTED OF AN OFFE NSE CONSTITUTING CRI MINAL MALFEASANCE , 1 | |
52 | + | MISFEASANCE , OR NONFEASANCE UNDER ANY FEDERAL OR STATE LAW. 2 | |
53 | + | ||
54 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 3 | |
55 | + | October 1, 2024. 4 | |
56 | + | ||
57 | + | ||
58 | + | ||
59 | + | ||
60 | + | Approved: | |
61 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
62 | + | Governor. | |
63 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
64 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. | |
65 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
66 | + | President of the Senate. |