House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-15) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (36-7) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {183325/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (122-12) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {363924/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 09/15/2023 | Pre-filed |