House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 874 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {253327/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |