House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 961 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {993827/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |