House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (98-34) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (36-9) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923322/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923322/1 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading Passed (99-38) | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {443623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |