House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {733027/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Floor Amendment {733427/1 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {523825/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|