House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (127-7) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623723/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |