House | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893226/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Pre-filed |