Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB55 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0055*  
  
HOUSE BILL 55 
P1   	4lr1042 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 88 
By: Delegate Pruski Delegates Pruski, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, 
Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, 
R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena–Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, 
Taveras, and White Holland 
Requested: October 18, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 6, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military Families 2 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military 3 
Families to study developing and implementing a strategic plan to make Maryland 4 
the best state for veterans and military families; and generally relating to the 5 
Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military Families.  6 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 7 
That: 8 
 
 (a) There is a Commission on Veterans and Military Families. 9 
 
 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 10 
 
 (1) the following members, appointed by the President of the Senate: 11 
 
 (i) a member of the Senate of Maryland who is also a member of the 12 
Maryland Senate Veterans Caucus; 13 
 
 (ii) a former member of the Senate of Maryland who is also a former 14 
member of the Maryland Senate Veterans Caucus; and 15  2 	HOUSE BILL 55  
 
 
 
 (iii) a representative of an organization that advocates on behalf of 1 
veterans and military families; 2 
 
 (2) the following members, appointed by the Speaker of the House: 3 
 
 (i) a member of the House of Delegates who is also a member of the 4 
Maryland House Veterans Caucus; 5 
 
 (ii) a former member of the House of Delegates who is also a former 6 
member of the Maryland House Veterans Caucus; and 7 
 
 (iii) a representative of an organization that advocates on behalf of 8 
veterans and military families; 9 
 
 (3) the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, or the Secretary’s designee; 10 
 
 (4) the Adjutant General, or the Adjutant General’s designee; 11 
 
 (5) the chair of the Maryland Veterans Commission, or the chair’s 12 
designee; 13 
 
 (6) the chair of the Maryland Veterans’ Home Commission, or the chair’s 14 
designee; 15 
 
 (7) the chair of the Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans 16 
Commission, or the chair’s designee; and 17 
 
 (8) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 18 
 
 (i) a representative of an organization that advocates on behalf of 19 
woman veterans; and 20 
 
 (ii) a representative of the reserve component of any branch of the 21 
armed forces of the United States, not including the National Guard;  22 
 
 (iii) an individual who is a military spouse or a representative of a 23 
military spouse advocacy group; 24 
 
 (iv) an individual with experience in health care, whether somatic 25 
health care or mental health care; and 26 
 
 (v) an individual with experience in workforce development.  27 
 
 (c) The Secretary of Veterans Affairs, or the Secretary’s designee, shall serve as 28 
chair of the Commission. 29 
   	HOUSE BILL 55 	3 
 
 
 (d) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall provide staff for the Commission. 1 
 
 (e) A member of the Commission: 2 
 
 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 3 
 
 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 4 
Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 5 
 
 (f) The Commission shall: 6 
 
 (1) study and make recommendations for developing and implementing a 7 
statewide strategic plan to make Maryland the best state for veterans and military families, 8 
including legislative and budgetary recommendations;  9 
 
 (2) while forming the recommendations and drafting the study required 10 
under item (1) of this subsection, consult with the Office of Military and Federal Affairs 11 
and the Maryland Military Installation Council in the Department of Commerce; and 12 
 
 (2) (3)  identify key performance indicators that can be compared to 13 
those of other states in order to assess the quality of life for veterans and military families 14 
in Maryland relative to other states. 15 
 
 (g) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission shall report its findings and 16 
recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 17 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 18 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 19 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 1 month and, at the end of June 20 
30, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 21 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 22 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.