House
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (104-34)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {903224/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (35-100)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {113026/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (32-103)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Floor Amendment {433229/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (33-101)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {193527/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
First Reading Economic Matters
|
|
|