House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Hearing 4/06 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/09/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |