LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB679
Action History
MD
Maryland House Bill HB679
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2024 Regular Session
Maryland House Bill HB679
Action History
Senate
03/08/2024
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
House
03/07/2024
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
House
03/05/2024
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
House
03/04/2024
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House
02/01/2024
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House
01/25/2024
First Reading Economic Matters