House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {783829/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Floor Amendment {683725/1 (Delegate Schmidt) Rejected (35-88)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Floor Amendment {123629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-88)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Floor Amendment {493622/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (37-90)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {573520/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|