House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (98-37) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (32-11) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {853128/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-36) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {203022/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |