House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {933526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |