Senate | 04/08/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {593127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-37) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {453927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |