Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {703024/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |