House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (31-16) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (33-13) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (31-14) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (94-38) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Floor Amendment {933523/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-97) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Floor Amendment {973929/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-95) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {533721/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/10/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |