Senate | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {303622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |