Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 892 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (111-23) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {833324/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Pre-filed |