Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 892 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 892 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 181) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0181* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations – Training and Reentry Services – Funding | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 181 | |
11 | + | E4 4lr1205 | |
12 | + | (PRE–FILED) CF HB 488 | |
13 | + | By: Senator McCray Senators McCray, Bailey, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth , | |
14 | + | Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, Jennings, King, Rosapepe, Salling, and | |
15 | + | Zucker | |
16 | + | Requested: October 27, 2023 | |
17 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
18 | + | Assigned to: Budget and Taxation | |
19 | + | Committee Report: Favorable with amendments | |
20 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
21 | + | Read second time: February 17, 2024 | |
10 | 22 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of requiring authorizing the Governor to include a certain appropriation | |
12 | - | in the annual budget bill for certain fiscal years to provide grants to certain | |
13 | - | qualifying nonprofit organizations that provide certain services to incarcerated or | |
14 | - | formerly incarcerated individuals; requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime | |
15 | - | Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the funds; and generally | |
16 | - | relating to reentry services and employment opportunities for formerly incarcerated | |
17 | - | individuals. | |
23 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
18 | 24 | ||
19 | - | BY adding to | |
20 | - | Article – Public Safety | |
21 | - | Section 4–1013 | |
22 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
23 | - | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) | |
25 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
24 | 26 | ||
25 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
26 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
27 | + | Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations – Training and Reentry Services – Funding 2 | |
27 | 28 | ||
28 | - | Article – Public Safety | |
29 | + | FOR the purpose of requiring authorizing the Governor to include a certain appropriation 3 | |
30 | + | in the annual budget bill for certain fiscal years to provide grants to certain 4 | |
31 | + | qualifying nonprofit organizations that provide certain services to incarcerated or 5 | |
32 | + | formerly incarcerated individuals; requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime 6 | |
33 | + | Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the funds; and generally 7 | |
34 | + | relating to reentry services and employment opportunities for formerly incarcerated 8 | |
35 | + | individuals. 9 | |
29 | 36 | ||
30 | - | 4–1013. | |
37 | + | BY adding to 10 | |
38 | + | Article – Public Safety 11 | |
39 | + | Section 4–1013 12 | |
40 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 13 | |
41 | + | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 14 | |
31 | 42 | ||
32 | - | ||
33 | - | ||
43 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 | |
44 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 | |
34 | 45 | ||
35 | - | (1) PROVIDES TRAINING AN D REENTRY ASSISTANCE FOR | |
36 | - | INCARCERATED AND FOR MERLY INCARCERATED I NDIVIDUALS; | |
46 | + | Article – Public Safety 17 | |
37 | 47 | ||
38 | - | (2) PROVIDES TRAINING FO R AT LEAST 50 INCARCERATED OR | |
39 | - | FORMERLY INCARCERATE D INDIVIDUALS PER YEAR IN AUTOMO TIVE REPAIR; | |
48 | + | 4–1013. 18 2 SENATE BILL 181 | |
40 | 49 | ||
41 | - | (3) IS ABLE TO PROVIDE A N AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR CERTIFICATE FROM | |
42 | - | A NATIONALLY RECOGNI ZED AUTOMOTIVE REPAI R ORGANIZATION TO EL IGIBLE | |
43 | - | PARTICIPANTS; AND | |
44 | 50 | ||
45 | - | (4) DEMONSTRATES A MINIM UM OF A 50% EMPLOYMENT PLACEMENT | |
46 | - | RATE FOR ELIGI BLE PARTICIPANTS IN A PAID AUTOMOTIVE RE PAIR JOB. | |
47 | - | Ch. 892 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
48 | 51 | ||
49 | - | – 2 – | |
50 | - | (B) FOR FISCAL YEARS 2026 THROUGH 2028, EACH YEAR THE GOVERNOR | |
51 | - | SHALL MAY INCLUDE IN THE ANNUA L BUDGET BILL AN APP ROPRIATION OF | |
52 | - | $1,000,000 TO BE USED SOLELY AS AN OPERATING GRANT T O QUALIFYING | |
53 | - | NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIONS FOR TH E PURPOSE OF PROVIDI NG TRAINING TO | |
54 | - | FORMERLY INCARCERATE D INDIVIDUALS IN AUT OMOTIVE REPAIR . | |
52 | + | (A) IN THIS SECTION, “QUALIFYING NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION ” MEANS AN 1 | |
53 | + | ORGANIZATION THAT : 2 | |
55 | 54 | ||
56 | - | (C) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND | |
57 | - | VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ADMINI STER THE GRANT FUNDS TO QUALIFYING | |
58 | - | NONPROFIT ORGANIZATI ONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 4–1008 OF THIS SUBTITLE. | |
55 | + | (1) PROVIDES TRAINING AN D REENTRY ASSISTANCE FOR 3 | |
56 | + | INCARCERATED AND FOR MERLY INCARCERATED I NDIVIDUALS; 4 | |
59 | 57 | ||
60 | - | (D) A QUALIFYING NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION THAT RE CEIVES A GRANT | |
61 | - | UNDER THIS SECTION S HALL SUBMIT FOR EACH FISCAL YEAR THE FOLL OWING TO | |
62 | - | THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, | |
63 | - | YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES: | |
58 | + | (2) PROVIDES TRAINING FO R AT LEAST 50 INCARCERATED OR 5 | |
59 | + | FORMERLY INCA RCERATED INDIVIDUALS PER YEAR IN AUTOMOTI VE REPAIR; 6 | |
64 | 60 | ||
65 | - | (1) PROOF OF THE EXPENDI TURE OF THE GRANT FU NDS AND THE | |
66 | - | PURPOSES FOR WHICH T HE FUNDS WERE EXPEND ED; | |
61 | + | (3) IS ABLE TO PROVIDE A N AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR CERTIFICATE FROM 7 | |
62 | + | A NATIONALLY RECOGNI ZED AUTOMOTIVE REPAI R ORGANIZATION TO EL IGIBLE 8 | |
63 | + | PARTICIPANTS; AND 9 | |
67 | 64 | ||
68 | - | ( | |
69 | - | ||
65 | + | (4) DEMONSTRATES A MINIM UM OF A 50% EMPLOYMENT PLACE MENT 10 | |
66 | + | RATE FOR ELIGIBLE PA RTICIPANTS IN A PAID AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR JO B. 11 | |
70 | 67 | ||
71 | - | (3) ANY RELATED O UTCOME–BASED PERFORMANCE ME ASURES. | |
68 | + | (B) FOR FISCAL YEARS 2026 THROUGH 2028, EACH YEAR THE GOVERNOR 12 | |
69 | + | SHALL MAY INCLUDE IN THE ANNUA L BUDGET BILL AN APP ROPRIATION OF 13 | |
70 | + | $1,000,000 TO BE USED SOLELY AS AN OPERATING GRANT T O QUALIFYING 14 | |
71 | + | NONPROFIT ORGANIZATI ONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING TRAININ G TO 15 | |
72 | + | FORMERLY INCARCERATE D INDIVIDUALS IN AUT OMOTIVE REPAIR . 16 | |
72 | 73 | ||
73 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July | |
74 | - | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and, at the end of June 30, 2028, | |
75 | - | this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and | |
76 | - | of no further force and effect. | |
74 | + | (C) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 17 | |
75 | + | VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ADMINI STER THE GRANT FUNDS TO QUALIFYING 18 | |
76 | + | NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIO NS IN ACCORDANCE WIT H § 4–1008 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 19 | |
77 | 77 | ||
78 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2024. | |
78 | + | (D) A QUALIFYING NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION THAT RE CEIVES A GRANT 20 | |
79 | + | UNDER THIS SECTION S HALL SUBMIT FOR EACH FISCAL YEAR THE FOLL OWING TO 21 | |
80 | + | THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 22 | |
81 | + | YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES: 23 | |
82 | + | ||
83 | + | (1) PROOF OF THE EXPENDI TURE OF THE GRANT FU NDS AND THE 24 | |
84 | + | PURPOSES FOR WHICH T HE FUNDS WERE EXPEND ED; 25 | |
85 | + | ||
86 | + | (2) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF INCARCERATED AND FOR MERLY 26 | |
87 | + | INCARCERATED INDIVID UALS WHO RECEIVED SE RVICES; AND 27 | |
88 | + | ||
89 | + | (3) ANY RELATED OUTCOME –BASED PERFORMANCE ME ASURES. 28 | |
90 | + | ||
91 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 29 | |
92 | + | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and, at the end of June 30, 2028, 30 | |
93 | + | this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 31 | |
94 | + | of no further force and effect. 32 | |
95 | + |