Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB181 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/27/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0181*  
  
SENATE BILL 181 
E4   	4lr1205 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 488 
By: Senator McCray Senators McCray, Bailey, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth , 
Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, Jennings, King, Rosapepe, Salling, and 
Zucker 
Requested: October 27, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 17, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations – Training and Reentry Services – Funding 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring authorizing the Governor to include a certain appropriation 3 
in the annual budget bill for certain fiscal years to provide grants to certain 4 
qualifying nonprofit organizations that provide certain services to incarcerated or 5 
formerly incarcerated individuals; requiring the Governor’s Office of Crime 6 
Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the funds; and generally 7 
relating to reentry services and employment opportunities for formerly incarcerated 8 
individuals.  9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – Public Safety 11 
Section 4–1013 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 14 
 
SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Article – Public Safety 17 
 
4–1013.  18  2 	SENATE BILL 181  
 
 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “QUALIFYING NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION ” MEANS AN 1 
ORGANIZATION THAT :  2 
 
 (1) PROVIDES TRAINING AN D REENTRY ASSISTANCE FOR 3 
INCARCERATED AND FOR MERLY INCARCERATED I NDIVIDUALS; 4 
 
 (2) PROVIDES TRAINING FO R AT LEAST 50 INCARCERATED OR 5 
FORMERLY INCA RCERATED INDIVIDUALS PER YEAR IN AUTOMOTI VE REPAIR; 6 
 
 (3) IS ABLE TO PROVIDE A N AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR CERTIFICATE FROM 7 
A NATIONALLY RECOGNI ZED AUTOMOTIVE REPAI R ORGANIZATION TO EL IGIBLE 8 
PARTICIPANTS; AND 9 
 
 (4) DEMONSTRATES A MINIM UM OF A 50% EMPLOYMENT PLACE MENT 10 
RATE FOR ELIGIBLE PA RTICIPANTS IN A PAID AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR JO B. 11 
 
(B) FOR FISCAL YEARS 2026 THROUGH 2028, EACH YEAR THE GOVERNOR 12 
SHALL MAY INCLUDE IN THE ANNUA L BUDGET BILL AN APP ROPRIATION OF 13 
$1,000,000 TO BE USED SOLELY AS AN OPERATING GRANT T O QUALIFYING 14 
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATI ONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING TRAININ G TO 15 
FORMERLY INCARCERATE D INDIVIDUALS IN AUT OMOTIVE REPAIR . 16 
 
 (C) THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, YOUTH, AND 17 
VICTIM SERVICES SHALL ADMINI STER THE GRANT FUNDS TO QUALIFYING 18 
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATIO NS IN ACCORDANCE WIT H § 4–1008 OF THIS SUBTITLE. 19 
 
 (D) A QUALIFYING NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION THAT RE CEIVES A GRANT 20 
UNDER THIS SECTION S HALL SUBMIT FOR EACH FISCAL YEAR THE FOLL OWING TO 21 
THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE GOVERNOR’S OFFICE OF CRIME PREVENTION, 22 
YOUTH, AND VICTIM SERVICES: 23 
 
 (1) PROOF OF THE EXPENDI TURE OF THE GRANT FU NDS AND THE 24 
PURPOSES FOR WHICH T HE FUNDS WERE EXPEND ED; 25 
 
 (2) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF 	INCARCERATED AND FOR MERLY 26 
INCARCERATED INDIVID UALS WHO RECEIVED SE RVICES; AND 27 
 
 (3) ANY RELATED OUTCOME –BASED PERFORMANCE ME ASURES. 28 
 
SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 29 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and, at the end of June 30, 2028, 30 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 31 
of no further force and effect.  32