House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {873525/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |