House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |