Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB486 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/05/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0486*  
  
SENATE BILL 486 
E5   	4lr1083 
    	CF 4lr3504 
By: Senators Hayes and M. Washington 
Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2024 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 22, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Correctional Services – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Management 2 
Council – Report  3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Correctional Enterprises Management Council 4 
to research and review certain information relating to goods and services provided 5 
by Maryland Correctional Enterprises; and generally relating to the Maryland 6 
Correctional Enterprises Management Council.  7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 8 
 Article – Correctional Services 9 
Section 3–521(a) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 
 (As enacted by Chapter 721 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023) 13 
 
BY adding to 14 
 Article – Correctional Services 15 
Section 3–521(e) 16 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 17 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows:  20 
 
Article – Correctional Services 21  2 	SENATE BILL 486  
 
 
 
3–521. 1 
 
 (a) (1) The Management Council shall: 2 
 
 (i) advise Maryland Correctional Enterprises on its specific 3 
proposals to establish new industries and improve the quality and quantity of job training 4 
programs; and 5 
 
 (ii) recommend the establishment and maintenance of industrial 6 
plants and service centers to be used for implementing the programs developed by the 7 
Commissioner and Chief Executive Officer under § 3–511 of this subtitle. 8 
 
 (2) Maryland Correctional Enterprises shall operate industrial plants and 9 
service centers recommended under paragraph (1)(ii) of this subsection primarily with 10 
incarcerated individuals in a manner that benefits the State and the training of 11 
incarcerated individuals by producing goods or providing services that are practical and 12 
adaptable for a prison industry. 13 
 
 (E) THE MANAGEMENT COUNCIL SHALL: 14 
 
 (1) RESEARCH: 15 
 
 (I)  THE NUMBER OF PRIVATE EN TITIES THAT OFFER GO ODS 16 
AND SERVICES THAT AR E ALSO AVAILABLE FROM MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL 17 
ENTERPRISES; AND 18 
 
 (II) THE AVERAGE PREVAILING MARKET PRICE S FOR THE 19 
GOODS AND SERVICES T HAT ARE AVAILABLE FR OM MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL 20 
ENTERPRISES;  21 
 
 (2) COMPARE THE COST OF GOODS AND SERVICES AVAILABLE FROM 22 
MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL ENTERPRISES AND THE C OST OF THE SAME GOODS AND 23 
SERVICES FROM PRIVATE ENTERPRISES ;  24 
 
 (3) REVIEW AND COMMENT ON THE POTENTIAL BENEFITS OF THE 25 
STATE SOLICITING PRIVATE ENTERPRISES TO PROVIDE THE GOODS AND SERVICES 26 
PROVIDED BY MARYLAND CORRECTIONAL ENTERPRISES; AND  27 
 
 (4) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, REPORT TO THE GENERAL 28 
ASSEMBLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, 29 
ON ITS RESEARCH AND FIN DINGS.  30 
  
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 31 
October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 32   	SENATE BILL 486 	3 
 
 
30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 1 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.