House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {873528/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (33-12) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Floor Amendment {693023/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (12-32) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163020/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163020/1 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |