House | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-11) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {843624/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |