Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 866 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-3) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {813128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {393724/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Finance |