Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 942 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (124-10) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {883727/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |