Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB729 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/23/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 942 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 942 
(Senate Bill 729) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Security Guards – Use of Force Reporting – Health Care–Related Physical 
Interventions 
Business Occupations and Professions – Security Guards – Use of Force 
Reporting, Standards, and Certifications 
 
FOR the purpose of providing that a health care–related physical intervention does not 
constitute use of force for purposes relating to a certain report required to be made 
to the Secretary of State Police; prohibiting a certain report from including certain 
information; requiring the employer of a security guard providing security guard 
services on the premises of a health care facility to report certain information to the 
Secretary of State Police; altering the effective date of certain provisions of law 
relating to security guards; and generally relating to use of force reporting by 
security guards.  
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – Business Occupations and Professions 
Section 19–414 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 (As enacted by Chapter 763 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Chapter 763 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023 
Section 2  
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Business Occupations and Professions 
 
19–414. 
 
 (a) (1) In this section[, “use] THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE 
MEANINGS INDICATED . 
 
 (2) “HEALTH CARE–RELATED PHYSICAL INT ERVENTION” MEANS AN 
ACT THAT IS: 
 
 (I) PERFORMED ON THE PRE MISES OF A HEALTH CA RE 
FACILITY, AS DEFINED IN § 15–10B–01 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE, AT THE  Ch. 942 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
DIRECTION OF A DOCTO R OR NURSE WHI LE ACTING IN THE COU RSE OF THE 
DOCTOR’S OR NURSE’S EMPLOYMENT ; AND 
 
 (II) 1. A PHYSICAL ACTION OR THE USE OF A DEVICE THAT 
CANNOT BE EASILY REM OVED TO PREVENT , SUPPRESS, OR CONTROL HEAD , BODY, 
OR LIMB MOVEMENT ; OR 
 
 2. THE ADMINISTRATION O F DRUGS WITH THE INTENT 
OF SIGNIFICANTLY CUR TAILING THE NORMAL M OBILITY OR NORMAL PH YSICAL 
ACTIVITY OF AN INDIV IDUAL IN ORDER TO PR OTECT THE INDIVIDUAL FROM 
INJURING THE INDIVID UAL OR ANOTHER . 
 
 (3) (I) “USE of force” means: 
 
 [(i)] 1. any physical striking of an individual; 
 
 [(ii)] 2. any significant physical contact that restricts the 
movement of an individual, including control techniques; or 
 
 [(iii)] 3. the detainment of an individual without the individual’s 
consent. 
 
 [(2)] (II) “Use of force” includes: 
 
 [(i)] 1. the discharge of a firearm; 
 
 [(ii)] 2. the discharge of pepper mace, as defined in § 4–101 of the 
Criminal Law Article; and 
 
 [(iii)] 3. the use of an electronic control device, as defined in §  
4–109 of the Criminal Law Article. 
 
 [(3)] (III) “Use of force” does not include mere presence, verbal commands, 
[or] escorting an individual with minimal resistance, OR A HEALTH CARE –RELATED 
PHYSICAL INTERVENTIO N THAT WAS REPORTED AS AN ADVERSE EVENT TO THE 
MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. 
 
 (b) (1) Subject to paragraph (2) of this subsection, a security guard shall report 
any use of force against a person while providing security guard services on behalf of the 
licensed security guard agency or for the security guard employer to the security guard 
agency or the security guard employer within 48 hours after the use of force on a form 
provided by the Secretary. 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 942 
 
– 3 – 
 (2) A security guard is not required to report any use of force against a 
person within 48 hours after the use of force if the security guard is seriously injured or 
disabled. 
 
 (c) (1) A EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBSECTION (D) OF THIS SECTION , A 
licensed security guard agency or security guard employer shall, in accordance with 
[paragraph] PARAGRAPHS (2) AND (3) of this subsection, report any use of force by a 
security guard while providing security guard services on its behalf or for it to the Secretary 
within 48 hours after receiving the form completed under subsection (b)(1) of this section. 
 
 (2) The use of force report under paragraph (1) of this subsection shall 
include: 
 
 (i) the type of encounter; 
 
 (ii) the type of force used; 
 
 (iii) the location of the incident where force was used; 
 
 (iv) whether the individual against whom force was used was 
arrested and, if known, what charges the individual received; 
 
 (v) whether the individual against whom force was used requested 
or required medical care; 
 
 (vi) whether the security guard requested or required medical care; 
 
 (vii) demographic information about any individuals against whom 
force was used and any security guard involved in the incident, including race, ethnicity, 
gender, and age; and 
 
 (viii) the form completed under subsection (b)(1) of this section. 
 
 (3) A USE OF FORCE REPORT UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS 
SUBSECTION MAY NOT INCL UDE INFORMATION THAT IS PROHIBITED FROM 
DISCLOSURE BY STATE OR FEDERAL LAW .  
 
 (D) THE EMPLOYER OF A SEC URITY GUARD PROVIDIN G SECURITY GUARD 
SERVICES ON THE PREM ISES OF A HEALTH CAR E FACILITY, AS DEFINED IN § 19–114 
OF THE HEALTH – GENERAL ARTICLE, SHALL REPORT EVERY 7 DAYS TO THE 
SECRETARY OF STATE POLICE ON THE NUMBER OF CODE GREENS INITI ATED FOR 
COMBATIVE PERSONS AN D CODE PURPLES INITI ATED FOR SECURITY –ONLY 
RESPONSES, AS THOSE EMERGENCY C ODES ARE IDENTIFIED IN TITLE 10 OF THE 
CODE OF MARYLAND REGULATIONS, OCCURRING IN THE PRE VIOUS 7 DAYS. 
  Ch. 942 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED , That the Laws of Maryland read 
as follows:  
 
Chapter 763 of the Acts of 2023 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
[June 1, 2024] JANUARY 1, 2025.  
 
 SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 1 of this Act shall 
take effect June 1, 2024 January 1, 2025, the effective date of Chapter 763 of the Acts of 
the General Assembly of 2023. If the effective date of Chapter 763 is amended, Section 1 of 
this Act shall take effect on the taking effect of Chapter 763.  
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, except as provided in Section 
3 of this Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2024.  
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2024.