Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {983527/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |