Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Floor Amendment {203320/1 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {113426/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {143226/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {823727/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|