Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Pre-filed |