Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 318 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 318 | |
5 | - | (Senate Bill 80) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *sb0080* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Estates and Trusts – Appointment of Personal Representative – Objections | |
10 | + | SENATE BILL 80 | |
11 | + | N2 4lr1372 | |
12 | + | (PRE–FILED) CF HB 326 | |
13 | + | By: Senator West | |
14 | + | Requested: November 1, 2023 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | Senate action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 3, 2024 | |
10 | 20 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of authorizing only an interested person or unpaid claimant, rather than | |
12 | - | any person, to file an objection to the appointment of a personal representative of an | |
13 | - | estate of a decedent; and generally relating to personal representatives. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
14 | 22 | ||
15 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
16 | - | Article – Estates and Trusts | |
17 | - | Section 7–103 | |
18 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
19 | - | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
20 | 24 | ||
21 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
22 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
25 | + | Estates and Trusts – Appointment of Personal Representative – Objections 2 | |
23 | 26 | ||
24 | - | Article – Estates and Trusts | |
27 | + | FOR the purpose of authorizing only an interested person or unpaid claimant, rather than 3 | |
28 | + | any person, to file an objection to the appointment of a personal representative of an 4 | |
29 | + | estate of a decedent; and generally relating to personal representatives. 5 | |
25 | 30 | ||
26 | - | 7–103. | |
31 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 | |
32 | + | Article – Estates and Trusts 7 | |
33 | + | Section 7–103 8 | |
34 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 9 | |
35 | + | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 | |
27 | 36 | ||
28 | - | (a) (1) After the appointment of a personal representative, the register shall | |
29 | - | have a notice of the appointment published in a newspaper of general circulation in the | |
30 | - | county of appointment once a week in 3 successive weeks, announcing the appointment and | |
31 | - | address of the personal representative, and notifying creditors of the estate to present their | |
32 | - | claims. | |
37 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 | |
38 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 | |
33 | 39 | ||
34 | - | (2) The personal representative shall file or have filed with the register a | |
35 | - | certification that a notice has been published. | |
40 | + | Article – Estates and Trusts 13 | |
36 | 41 | ||
37 | - | ||
42 | + | 7–103. 14 | |
38 | 43 | ||
39 | - | “To all persons interested in the estate of .......................: | |
44 | + | (a) (1) After the appointment of a personal representative, the register shall 15 | |
45 | + | have a notice of the appointment published in a newspaper of general circulation in the 16 | |
46 | + | county of appointment once a week in 3 successive weeks, announcing the appointment and 17 | |
47 | + | address of the personal representative, and notifying creditors of the estate to present their 18 | |
48 | + | claims. 19 2 SENATE BILL 80 | |
40 | 49 | ||
41 | - | This is to give notice that the undersigned, ……… whose address is ……… was, on | |
42 | - | ………, appointed personal representative of the estate of ……… who died on …… (with) | |
43 | - | (without) a will. | |
44 | 50 | ||
45 | - | [All persons having any objection to the appointment (or to the probate of the will of | |
46 | - | the decedent) shall file the same with the register of wills on or before 6 months from the | |
47 | - | date of the appointment.] | |
48 | - | Ch. 318 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
49 | 51 | ||
50 | - | – 2 – | |
51 | - | ALL INTERESTED PERSONS OR UNPAID CLAIMANTS HAV ING ANY OBJECTION | |
52 | - | TO THE APPOINTMENT O F THE PERSONAL REPRE SENTATIVE SHALL FILE THE SAME | |
53 | - | WITH THE REGISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE | |
54 | - | APPOINTMENT . | |
52 | + | (2) The personal representative shall file or have filed with the register a 1 | |
53 | + | certification that a notice has been published. 2 | |
55 | 54 | ||
56 | - | ALL PERSONS HAVING ANY OBJECTION TO THE PROBATE OF THE WILL OF THE | |
57 | - | DECEDENT SHALL FILE THE SAME WITH THE RE GISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 | |
58 | - | MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE APPOINTMENT . | |
55 | + | (b) The notice of appointment shall be substantially in the following form: 3 | |
59 | 56 | ||
60 | - | All persons having claims against the decedent must present their claims to the | |
61 | - | undersigned, or file them with the register of wills on or before the earlier of the following | |
62 | - | dates: | |
57 | + | “To all persons interested in the estate of .......................: 4 | |
63 | 58 | ||
64 | - | (1) 6 months from the date of the decedent’s death; or | |
59 | + | This is to give notice that the undersigned, ……… whose address is ……… was, on 5 | |
60 | + | ………, appointed personal representative of the estate of ……… who died on …… (with) 6 | |
61 | + | (without) a will. 7 | |
65 | 62 | ||
66 | - | (2) 2 months after the personal representative mails or otherwise delivers | |
67 | - | to the creditor a copy of this published notice or other written notice, notifying the creditor | |
68 | - | that the creditor’s claim will be barred unless the creditor presents the claim within 2 | |
69 | - | months from the mailing or other delivery of the notice. | |
63 | + | [All persons having any objection to the appointment (or to the probate of the will of 8 | |
64 | + | the decedent) shall file the same with the register of wills on or before 6 months from the 9 | |
65 | + | date of the appointment.] 10 | |
70 | 66 | ||
71 | - | Any claim not filed on or before that date, or any extension provided by law, is | |
72 | - | unenforceable thereafter. | |
67 | + | ALL INTERESTED PERSON S OR UNPAID CLAIMANTS HAV ING ANY OBJECTION 11 | |
68 | + | TO THE APPOINTMENT O F THE PERSONAL REPRE SENTATIVE SHALL FILE THE SAME 12 | |
69 | + | WITH THE REGISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE 13 | |
70 | + | APPOINTMENT . 14 | |
73 | 71 | ||
74 | - | …………………………… | |
75 | - | Personal representative | |
76 | - | Date of first publication: | |
77 | - | ……………………………”. | |
72 | + | ALL PERSONS HAVING ANY OBJECTION TO THE PROBATE OF THE W ILL OF THE 15 | |
73 | + | DECEDENT SHALL FILE THE SAME WITH THE RE GISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 16 | |
74 | + | MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE APPOINTMENT . 17 | |
78 | 75 | ||
79 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
80 | - | October 1, 2024. | |
76 | + | All persons having claims against the decedent must present their claims to the 18 | |
77 | + | undersigned, or file them with the register of wills on or before the earlier of the following 19 | |
78 | + | dates: 20 | |
81 | 79 | ||
82 | - | Approved by the Governor, April 25, 2024. | |
80 | + | (1) 6 months from the date of the decedent’s death; or 21 | |
81 | + | ||
82 | + | (2) 2 months after the personal representative mails or otherwise delivers 22 | |
83 | + | to the creditor a copy of this published notice or other written notice, notifying the creditor 23 | |
84 | + | that the creditor’s claim will be barred unless the creditor presents the claim within 2 24 | |
85 | + | months from the mailing or other delivery of the notice. 25 | |
86 | + | ||
87 | + | Any claim not filed on or before that date, or any extension provided by law, is 26 | |
88 | + | unenforceable thereafter. 27 | |
89 | + | ||
90 | + | …………………………… 28 | |
91 | + | Personal representative 29 | |
92 | + | Date of first publication: 30 | |
93 | + | ……………………………”. 31 | |
94 | + | ||
95 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32 | |
96 | + | October 1, 2024. 33 |