Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB80 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
         *sb0080*  
  
SENATE BILL 80 
N2   	4lr1372 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 326 
By: Senator West 
Requested: November 1, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Judicial Proceedings 
Committee Report: Favorable 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 3, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Estates and Trusts – Appointment of Personal Representative – Objections 2 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing only an interested person or unpaid claimant, rather than 3 
any person, to file an objection to the appointment of a personal representative of an 4 
estate of a decedent; and generally relating to personal representatives. 5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 
 Article – Estates and Trusts 7 
Section 7–103 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – Estates and Trusts 13 
 
7–103. 14 
 
 (a) (1) After the appointment of a personal representative, the register shall 15 
have a notice of the appointment published in a newspaper of general circulation in the 16 
county of appointment once a week in 3 successive weeks, announcing the appointment and 17 
address of the personal representative, and notifying creditors of the estate to present their 18 
claims. 19  2 	SENATE BILL 80  
 
 
 
 (2) The personal representative shall file or have filed with the register a 1 
certification that a notice has been published. 2 
 
 (b) The notice of appointment shall be substantially in the following form: 3 
 
 “To all persons interested in the estate of .......................: 4 
 
 This is to give notice that the undersigned, ……… whose address is ……… was, on 5 
………, appointed personal representative of the estate of ……… who died on …… (with) 6 
(without) a will.  7 
 
 [All persons having any objection to the appointment (or to the probate of the will of 8 
the decedent) shall file the same with the register of wills on or before 6 months from the 9 
date of the appointment.] 10 
 
 ALL INTERESTED PERSON S OR UNPAID CLAIMANTS HAV ING ANY OBJECTION 11 
TO THE APPOINTMENT O F THE PERSONAL REPRE SENTATIVE SHALL FILE THE SAME 12 
WITH THE REGISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE 13 
APPOINTMENT . 14 
 
 ALL PERSONS HAVING ANY OBJECTION TO THE PROBATE OF THE W ILL OF THE 15 
DECEDENT SHALL FILE THE SAME WITH THE RE GISTER OF WILLS ON OR BEFORE 6 16 
MONTHS FROM THE DATE OF THE APPOINTMENT .  17 
 
 All persons having claims against the decedent must present their claims to the 18 
undersigned, or file them with the register of wills on or before the earlier of the following 19 
dates:  20 
 
 (1) 6 months from the date of the decedent’s death; or  21 
 
 (2) 2 months after the personal representative mails or otherwise delivers 22 
to the creditor a copy of this published notice or other written notice, notifying the creditor 23 
that the creditor’s claim will be barred unless the creditor presents the claim within 2 24 
months from the mailing or other delivery of the notice.  25 
 
 Any claim not filed on or before that date, or any extension provided by law, is 26 
unenforceable thereafter. 27 
 
                                …………………………… 28 
                                Personal representative 29 
Date of first publication:  30 
……………………………”. 31 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 32 
October 1, 2024. 33