House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {613225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |