Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (128-11) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {153523/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {223627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Pre-filed |