Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Feldman) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Pre-filed |