House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (35-11) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (102-37) | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {783824/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | First Reading Economic Matters |