Senate | 03/15/2025 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | First Reading Appropriations |