House | 04/04/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |