House | 04/04/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (116-21) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {283827/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |